This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/03/2019 at 10:48:04 (UTC).

Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc,EVANS, K vs GEICO General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/12/2018 Medical Chiropractic Clinic Inc,EVANS, K filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Berkowitz, Mattis. Herbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9939

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Berkowitz, Mattis. Herbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

P.O. Box 15063

St. Petersburg, FL 33733

EVANS, K

Defendant

GEICO General Insurance Company

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As R A 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEFF , CASIM ADAM

Attorney at NEFF INSURANCE LAW, PLLC

4051 27Th Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendant Attorney

ABERCROMBIE , JAMES C

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 500

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/12/2018: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/12/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/12/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/12/2018: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/12/2018: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/15/2018: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/06/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/28/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELIEF; Comment: DEFENDANT S - FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Comment: FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: (FIRST0 TO PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: (FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: BY THE CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA. ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, 2/6/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less