This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/01/2020 at 03:40:06 (UTC).

Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc,HOLLEY, C vs Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Medical Chiropractic Clinic Inc,HOLLEY, C filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Moody, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3532

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Moody, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

HOLLEY, C

Defendant

Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEFF , CASIM ADAM

Attorney at NEFF INSURANCE LAW, PLLC

Po Box 15063

St Petersburg, FL 33733

Defendant Attorney

MANGENEY , AUGUST WILLIAM

Attorney at LDP LAW AND ASSOCIATES

11555 Heron Bay Blvd Ste 100A

Coral Springs, FL 33076

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/28/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/28/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/28/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/05/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/02/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company; Private Attorney: MANGENEY , AUGUST WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: BY THE CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA - ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, 3/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medical & Chiropractic Clinic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEFF , CASIM ADAM