This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/15/2021 at 06:09:20 (UTC).

Notice of Appeal of:MCDONALD, ROBYN MYNNON vs NGUYEN, ANH

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Notice of Appeal of MCDONALD, ROBYN MYNNON filed an Other lawsuit against NGUYEN, ANH. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9302

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDONALD, ROBYN MYNNON

Tampa, FL 33613

Defendants

NGUYEN, SANG

Tampa, FL 33682

NGUYEN, ANH

Tampa, FL 33682

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAMER, JESSICA SARAH

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT

100 N Tampa St Ste 4100

Tampa, FL 33602-3642

Defendant Attorney

DICKS, JOHN LARRY, II

Attorney at AKERMAN LLP

401 E Jackson St Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

APPEAL INVOICE

11/30/2020: APPEAL INVOICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2020530936; Judge: Division, F H R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MCDONALD, ROBYN MYNNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketORDER; Comment: TO PAY FILING FEE 12/02/20 RAN; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MCDONALD, ROBYN MYNNON; Date 2: 12/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF NEW CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEAL INVOICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketAPPEAL TO CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less