Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/25/2021 at 02:56:06 (UTC).

MATHEWS, MEGAN vs AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 MATHEWS, MEGAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, Jennifer. X and Gabbard, X. Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1067

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATHEWS, MEGAN

Clearwater, FL 33759

Defendant

AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.

1 Asi Way

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAPF , GRANT WILLIAM

Attorney at KRAPF LEGAL, P.A.

2790 Sunset Point Rd

Clearwater, FL 33759

Defendant Attorney

HAAS , RAYMOND A

Attorney at HD LAW PARTNERS

Po Box 23567

Tampa, FL 33623

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/05/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/05/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

02/05/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/05/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/05/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MATHEWS, MEGAN; Private Attorney: KRAPF , GRANT WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.; Date Signed: 04/05/2021; Judicial Officer: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT 03/31/21 JXG; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.; Date Signed: 03/31/2021; Judicial Officer: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.; Plaintiff: MATHEWS, MEGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.; Plaintiff: MATHEWS, MEGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.; Plaintiff: MATHEWS, MEGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.; Plaintiff: MATHEWS, MEGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.; Plaintiff: MATHEWS, MEGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.; Plaintiff: MATHEWS, MEGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.; Plaintiff: MATHEWS, MEGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.; Plaintiff: MATHEWS, MEGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT W KRAPF, ESQ