Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/06/2021 at 20:30:12 (UTC).

Martinez, Rosiel vs Lorenzana, Marcel Rojas

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Martinez, Rosiel filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lorenzana, Marcel Rojas. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3234

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martinez, Rosiel

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Defendants

Allstate Insurance Company

C/O Department Of Financial Services 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Salazar, Irlanda Cortez

Tampa, FL 33607

Lorenzana, Marcel Rojas

Tampa, FL 33607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LATOUR-ELIZALDE , EDUARDO R

135 E Lemon St

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Defendant Attorney

GOODENOUGH , ANDREW A

Attorney at ALLSTATE STAFF COUNSEL

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 800

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

05/11/2021: ANSWER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/26/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/28/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/28/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/16/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Lorenzana, Marcel Rojas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, 5/6/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: MARCELA ROJAS LORENZANA, 4/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: IRLANDA CORTEZ SALAZAR, 4/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martinez, Rosiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martinez, Rosiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martinez, Rosiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martinez, Rosiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martinez, Rosiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martinez, Rosiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martinez, Rosiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company; Defendant: Lorenzana, Marcel Rojas; Defendant: Salazar, Irlanda Cortez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW A GOODENOUGH