This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/10/2022 at 09:37:53 (UTC).

MARTINEZ, IVON vs HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 MARTINEZ, IVON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, Emily. A, Peacock, Emily A and Peacock, A. Emily. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9090

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, Emily. A

Peacock, Emily A

Peacock, A. Emily

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ, ALBERLARDO

Orlando, FL 32801

MARTINEZ, IVON

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL , JERROD MACKENZIE

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF JERROD PAUL, P.A.

37 N Orange Ave Ste 500

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

DURYEA , SCOTT BRANDON

Attorney at HERITAGE INSURANCE

1401 N West Shore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/15/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/15/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/15/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/15/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/16/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/20/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

06/21/2022: NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

06/24/2022: ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/19/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/19/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/3058068636 MEETING ID: 305-806-8636 NO PASSWORD IS REQUIREDTELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME CODE AS ZOOM ID Judicial Officer: Peacock, Emily A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Date Signed: 06/24/2022; Judicial Officer: Peacock, Emily A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, IVON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, ALBERLARDO; Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, IVON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, ALBERLARDO; Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, IVON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, ALBERLARDO; Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, IVON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, ALBERLARDO; Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, IVON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL JERROD M