This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/09/2019 at 10:57:48 (UTC).

Martin, Reinaldo vs BAAS Holdings LLC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Martin, Reinaldo filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BAAS Holdings LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas, K. Cheryl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0213

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas, K. Cheryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin, Reinaldo

Brandon, FL 33511

Defendants

Bellur, Balaji

Tampa, FL 33610

BAAS Holdings LLC

16192 Coastal Hwy

Lewes, DE 19958

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE , KYLE JAMES

Attorney at LEE LAW, PLLC

1971 W Lumsden Rd # 303

Brandon, FL 33511

Defendant Attorney

VIGH , ROBERT ALEXANDER

Attorney at ROBERT A. VIGH

P O Box 2278

Riverview, FL 33568-2278

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/01/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

06/11/2019: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/29/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

02/19/2019: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

NOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL

02/07/2019: NOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL

REQUEST

02/04/2019: REQUEST

NOTICE

02/04/2019: NOTICE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/31/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/18/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/18/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/18/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/17/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/17/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/16/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/08/2019: COMPLAINT

LETTER TO

01/08/2019: LETTER TO

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/07/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/07/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: DEFT'S MOTION TO AMEND ITS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND TO ADD COUNTERCLAIM; Additional Info: Defendant: BAAS Holdings LLC; Defendant: Bellur, Balaji; Date Signed: 06/13/2019; Judicial Officer: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • ORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: DEFT'S - FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: BAAS Holdings LLC; Defendant: Bellur, Balaji; Date 2: 06/13/2019; Judicial Officer: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO AMEND ITS ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO; Comment: DEF. MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DEPOSITION DESIGNATION; Comment: BALAJI BELLUR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Defendant: BAAS Holdings LLC; Defendant: Bellur, Balaji

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 kyle@kyleleelaw.com ; info@kyleleelaw.com ; kylejameslee@yahoo.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER TO; Comment: ATTORNEY RE: SUMMONS kyle@kyleleelaw.com ; info@kyleleelaw.com ; kylejameslee@yahoo.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Martin, Reinaldo

    Read MoreRead Less