This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/22/2021 at 05:58:00 (UTC).

KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child vs Medina, Mariana

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against , a minor child. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher and Nash, Christopher. C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1324

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maroto, Katia

Jacksonville, FL 32202

KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

Medina, Mariana

Gibsonton, FL 33534

Garcia-Sahagun, Silvia E.

Gibsonton, FL 33534

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTIGLIATTI , STEFANO DI

Attorney at COKER LAW

136 E Bay St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS , BENJAMIN STYONS

Attorney at MARTINEZ DENBO, LLC.

2935 1St Ave N Ste 2

St Petersburg, FL 33713

SCHEELE , BRANDON ROBERT

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

MCRITCHIE , TROY J.

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER, P A

360 Central Ave Ste 700

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

CASH , CARY ALAN

Attorney at FREEMAN, GOLDIS & CASH

2553 1St Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33713

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/02/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/15/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/15/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/15/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/15/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

08/04/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

07/13/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/13/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/09/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/26/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

04/16/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/22/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/22/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/13/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: Garcia-Sahagun, Silvia E.; Defendant: Medina, Mariana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Medina, Mariana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Garcia-Sahagun, Silvia E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: KATIA MAROTO, as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.V., a minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Portigliatti, Stefano Di