This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/05/2021 at 12:30:11 (UTC).

Marin, Miguel vs CT Transportation LLC

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Marin, Miguel filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CT Transportation LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas, K. Cheryl and Thomas, Cheryl. K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3368

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Thomas, K. Cheryl

Thomas, Cheryl. K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marin, Miguel

Ruskin, FL 33570

Defendants

CT Transportation LLC

Co Corporation Service Company 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Lawless, Barry Thomas, Jr

Lexington, SC 29073

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTIGLIATTI , STEFANO DI

Attorney at COKER LAW

136 E Bay St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/06/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/05/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/05/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/03/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/03/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/22/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/22/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/21/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/21/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/21/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/21/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Marin, Miguel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: Plaintiff s Motion to Set for Trial 9/21/2021 @9:30AM (ZOOM); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Marin, Miguel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: CT Transportation LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Lawless, Barry Thomas, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: CT Transportation LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Lawless, Barry Thomas, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Comment: "A" / 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC 5/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Comment: "A" / 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON BARRY THOMAS LAWLESS, JR. 5/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: CT Transportation LLC; Defendant: Lawless, Barry Thomas, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Marin, Miguel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Marin, Miguel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Marin, Miguel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Marin, Miguel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Marin, Miguel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CT Transportation LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Portigliatti, Stefano Di