This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/19/2023 at 22:49:39 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs Philson, Gale

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Philson, Gale. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0339

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

Defendant

Philson, Gale

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASIN , HUNTER MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

DAUTA , OMAIRA PATRICIA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/15/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/15/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

12/19/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/15/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/18/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/27/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

JOINT STIPULATION

02/06/2023: JOINT STIPULATION

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

02/07/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

COURT TICKET

02/07/2023: COURT TICKET

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/10/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023103642; Judge: Judge, Senior

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 309 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Judge, Senior

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET; Comment: HEARD BY JUDGE G. FERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: AT PRETRIAL. HEARD BY JUDGE G. FERNANDEZ; Additional Info: Defendant: Philson, Gale;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Defendant: Philson, Gale; Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFT: GALE PHILSON- 1/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Philson, Gale;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Philson, Gale;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less