This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/12/2021 at 11:23:28 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs Johnson, William

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Johnson, William. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7164

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

Johnson, William

Ruskin, FL 33570-4962

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROEBUCK , ANDREA MARIE

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

Defendant Attorney

RICARDO , JASON JOAQUIN

Attorney at RICARDO & WASYLIK, PL

Po Box 2245

Dade City, FL 33526

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/07/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/02/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/17/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

09/24/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/17/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Johnson, William

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: William Johnson 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Johnson, William

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROEBUCK , ANDREA M