This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/27/2022 at 17:05:52 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs Harper, Angel

Case Summary

On 06/25/2022 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Harper, Angel. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4893

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

Harper, Angel

Brandon, FL 33511-1260

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINES , MICHELLE KIM

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/25/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/25/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

06/28/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/20/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ANGEL HARPER 07/19/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Harper, Angel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM