This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/12/2022 at 00:40:50 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs Hamby, Shawn

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hamby, Shawn. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James S, Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5372

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, James S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

Hamby, Shawn

Tampa, FL 33607-7246

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASIN , HUNTER MICHAEL

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

08/15/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

08/19/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/97219657408 ZOOM MEETING ID IS 972-1965-7408PASSWORD IS 031612 Judicial Officer: Giardina, James S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SHAWN HAMBY 08/18/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Hamby, Shawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lvnv Funding Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASIN, HUNTER MICHAEL