This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/10/2023 at 03:00:34 (UTC).

LUTTRELL, AKAYLA vs LUXOTTICA RETAIL NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 LUTTRELL, AKAYLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUXOTTICA RETAIL NORTH AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1478

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUTTRELL, AKAYLA

Defendants

CONNOR, THOMAS C.

LUXOTTICA RETAIL NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MASTRILLI , KENNETH W

SCAVO , DOMINIC RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

BOOS, ROBERT WALTER, II

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/19/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

06/18/2021: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/19/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

04/25/2022: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

03/23/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

02/28/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

12/21/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

12/08/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY CHARGING LIEN

09/12/2022: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY CHARGING LIEN

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/09/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/08/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/08/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/08/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/08/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

08/01/2022: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

07/20/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SERVING

07/20/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order; Hearing Time: 03:45 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ATTORNEY CHARGING LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022444745; Judge: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION; Comment: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF 08/01/22 ALGM; Additional Info: Defendant: CONNOR, THOMAS C.; Defendant: LUXOTTICA RETAIL NORTH AMERICA, INC.; Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA; Date Signed: 08/01/2022; Judicial Officer:: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LUTTRELL, AKAYLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: CONNOR, THOMAS C.; Defendant: LUXOTTICA RETAIL NORTH AMERICA, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less