This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 12/12/2021 at 14:16:38 (UTC).

LOWMAN, BEVERLY vs SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 LOWMAN, BEVERLY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul, Huey, Paul. L and Huey, Paul L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5489

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

Huey, Paul L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOWMAN, BEVERLY

Tampa, FL 33610

LOWMAN, WILLIE

Tampa, FL 33610

Defendants

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY DBA SECURITY FIRS

1001 Broadway Avenue

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

1001 Broadway Avenue

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ , ROBERT FRANCIS

Attorney at THE FLORIDA INSURANCE LAW GROUP, LLC

8724 Sw 72Nd St # 260

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant Attorney

MITCHELL , WILLIAM MATTHEW

Attorney at CONROY SIMBERG

Tampa, Florida 33602 201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/30/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

11/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

11/23/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

11/03/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PRIVILEGE LOG

11/03/2021: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/03/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/08/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/09/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/09/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/30/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/30/2021: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/30/2021: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/30/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

06/30/2021: COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

06/30/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/30/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/30/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/7196320493 MEETING ID 791 632 0493TELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME ACCESS CODE AS ZOOM Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LOWMAN, BEVERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LOWMAN, BEVERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LOWMAN, BEVERLY; Plaintiff: LOWMAN, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LOWMAN, BEVERLY; Plaintiff: LOWMAN, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LOWMAN, BEVERLY; Plaintiff: LOWMAN, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LOWMAN, BEVERLY; Plaintiff: LOWMAN, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LOWMAN, BEVERLY; Plaintiff: LOWMAN, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LOWMAN, BEVERLY; Plaintiff: LOWMAN, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: LOWMAN, BEVERLY; Plaintiff: LOWMAN, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL WILLIAM M S