This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/17/2022 at 07:20:56 (UTC).

LOVE, SYDNEY vs LOVE, ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 LOVE, SYDNEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LOVE, ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel, L. Helene, Daniel, Helene. L and Daniel, Helene L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1541

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Daniel, L. Helene

Daniel, Helene. L

Daniel, Helene L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOVE, SYDNEY

Clearwater, FL 33764

Respondents

LOVE, ALEXANDER

Seminole, FL 33772

SALISBURY, CASEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILLIAMS , SUZANNE ELIZABETH

757 Se 17Th St 743

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Respondent Attorney

ALVERO , KHARA A.

14217 3Rd St

Dade City, FL 33523

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TERMINATION NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REPRESENTATION; Comment: CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION; Additional Info: Respondent: LOVE, ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY; Comment: (CC TO BVS); Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY; Respondent: LOVE, ALEXANDER; Respondent: SALISBURY, CASEY; Date Signed: 03/15/2022; Judicial Officer: Daniel, Helene L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PARENTING PLAN FOR CHILD KBS (WITH SIGNATURE PAGES) - ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY; Respondent: LOVE, ALEXANDER; Respondent: SALISBURY, CASEY; Signed: 02/14/2022; Judicial Officer: Daniel, Helene L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTCHD PARENTING PLAN FOR CHILD KBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Date Signed: 01/12/2022; Judicial Officer: Daniel, Helene L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: FLORIDA DRIVER LICENSE; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketINITIAL JURISDICTION ORDER; Additional Info: Date 2: 12/09/2021; Judicial Officer: Daniel, Helene L

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (Initial Case Filing); Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Comment: (DISSOLUTION AND PATERNITY); Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOVE, SYDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINATION PER FRGPJA 2.420(d)(2)(B); Comment: E-FILED Filing # 132942837

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS , SUZANNE ELIZABETH