This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/14/2021 at 01:42:18 (UTC).

LOUX, JESSE vs SHELBY, JACQUELYN

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 LOUX, JESSE filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHELBY, JACQUELYN. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Weis, Richard. A, Weis, A. Richard and Weis, Richard A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5135

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Weis, Richard. A

Weis, A. Richard

Weis, Richard A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOUX, JESSE

Valrico, FL 33596

Respondent

SHELBY, JACQUELYN

Dover, FL 33527

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCNEAL , VICTORIA

Attorney at THE SPRING OF TAMPA BAY

Po Box 5147

Tampa, FL 33675

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • HearingAmended Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL RESPONDENT SERVED; Comment: INSUFFICIENT EVIDENCE Document electronically transmitted to HCSO on 2021-06-29 12:17. ; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOUX, JESSE; Respondent: SHELBY, JACQUELYN; Date Signed: 06/29/2021; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TERMINATION NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REPRESENTATION; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOUX, JESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS; Comment: COURT WILL ADDRESS RESPONDENT'S MTN FOR MODIFICATION OF INJUNCTION (FILED 5/27/2021) AT THE UPCOMING 6/29/2021 HEARING; COPY MAILED TO RESPONDENT; Additional Info: Respondent: SHELBY, JACQUELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS; Comment: COURT WILL ADDRESS RESPONDENT'S 5/27/2021 MTN FOR HEARING AT THE UPCOMING HEARING 6/29/2021; COPY MAILED TO RESPONDENT; Additional Info: Respondent: SHELBY, JACQUELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR HEARING; Additional Info: Respondent: SHELBY, JACQUELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: FOR MODIFICATION OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION; Additional Info: Respondent: SHELBY, JACQUELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketFILE SENT TO; Comment: MOTION FOR HEARING AND MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION SENT TO JUDGE VIA EMAIL AND RED SLEEVE FOLDER VIA INTEROFFICE MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketAMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SERVED IN PLANT CITY BY DEPUTY GROOMS; Additional Info: Respondent: SHELBY, JACQUELYN; Service Date: 05/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSTAY AWAY FROM; Comment: ROBINSON ELEMENTARY SCHOOL, 4801 TURKEY CREEK RD, PLANT CITY, FL 33567; DECKER THERAPY SERVICES, 911 S. PARSONS AVE, STE A, BRANDON, FL 33511; JOSEPH SHELBY; DANIEL LOUX; PATRICIA LOUX; DIANNE SHELBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN); Additional Info: Petitioner: LOUX, JESSE; Respondent: SHELBY, JACQUELYN; Date Signed: 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOUX, JESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO MODIFY; Comment: INJUNCTION; Additional Info: Petitioner: LOUX, JESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: MOTION FOR MODIFICATION SENT TO JUDGE IN RED SLEEVE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNEAL , VICTORIA