This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/22/2021 at 08:29:24 (UTC).

Loman, David vs ABM Industries Incorporated

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Loman, David filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ABM Industries Incorporated. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Battles, Emmett. L and Battles, L. Emmett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1842

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Battles, Emmett. L

Battles, L. Emmett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Loman, Erica

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Loman, David

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Defendants

ABM Industries Incorporated

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

John Doe

Tampa, FL 33607

ABM Aviation, Inc.

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD, KEN, Esquire

Attorney at WARD - MITCHELL

701 Bayshore Blvd #101/102

Tampa, FL 33606-2710

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/01/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/01/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Loman, David; Plaintiff: Loman, Erica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Loman, David; Plaintiff: Loman, Erica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON OBJECTION; Comment: TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: ABM Industries Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Loman, David; Plaintiff: Loman, Erica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: ABM Industries Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON OBJECTION; Comment: TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: ABM Industries Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Loman, David; Plaintiff: Loman, Erica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: ABM Industries Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Loman, David; Plaintiff: Loman, Erica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Loman, David; Plaintiff: Loman, Erica

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: ABM Aviation, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: NO COS / NO EXHIBITS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Loman, David; Plaintiff: Loman, Erica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Loman, David; Plaintiff: Loman, Erica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Loman, David; Plaintiff: Loman, Erica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: ABM Industries Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ward, Ken

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ward, Ken

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ward, Ken

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ward, Ken

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM AVIATION INC. is a litigant