This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 09:12:11 (UTC).

Llobet-Azua, Leowelt vs Maldonado, Hector Manual, Jr

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Llobet-Azua, Leowelt filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Maldonado, Hector Manual, Jr. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4252

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

Tampa, FL 33634

Defendants

Maldonado, Hector Manual, Jr

Tampa, FL 33624

American Recovery Corporation

C/O Registered Agent: Hector A. Roman 4816 N. Cortez Avenue

Tampa, FL 33614

H D R of Tampa, Inc.

C/O Registered Agent: Walter Maldonado 29521 Morningmist Drive

Wesley Chapel, FL 33543

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ , MARTIN JOHN

Attorney at FERNANDEZ AND HERNANDEZ, LLC

3002 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorney

WEEKLEY , PAUL MARSHALL

Attorney at WEEKLEY SCHULTE VALDES, LLC

1635 N Tampa St Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/07/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/20/2022: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/20/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/20/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/20/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

05/20/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/20/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/20/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/20/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/91757641087 MEETING ID 917 5764 1087PASSWORD 973927 Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: American Recovery Corporation; Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Defendant: Maldonado, Hector Manual, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: American Recovery Corporation; Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Defendant: Maldonado, Hector Manual, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x3; Additional Info: Defendant: American Recovery Corporation; Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Defendant: Maldonado, Hector Manual, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Plaintiff: Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Plaintiff: Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Plaintiff: Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Plaintiff: Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Plaintiff: Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Plaintiff: Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Plaintiff: Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Plaintiff: Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Plaintiff: Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Plaintiff: Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: H D R of Tampa, Inc.; Plaintiff: Llobet-Azua, Leowelt

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Recovery Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Hdr Of Tampa, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weekley, Paul Marshall