This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/24/2020 at 09:19:42 (UTC).

Lingle, Nicholas vsAkishina, Ksenia

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Lingle, Nicholas vsAkishina, Ksenia was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas, K. Cheryl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0576

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas, K. Cheryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lingle, Nicholas

Tampa, FL 33626

Defendant

Akishina, Ksenia

Tampa, FL 33625

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RINKER , ROCKY L.

Attorney at ROCKY RINKER, ATTORNEY AT LAW, P.A.

222 2Nd St N

St Petersburg, FL 33701

DARBY , AMY MICHELE

Attorney at BUSH ROSS, P.A.

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

DEGIROLAMO , JOHNNY G

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN DEGIROLAMO, ESQ.

In Law We Trust, P.A. 1005 N Marion St

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING

02/13/2020: NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION FOR AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES

01/28/2020: MOTION FOR AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

01/28/2020: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/30/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER GRANTING

10/25/2019: ORDER GRANTING

MOTION TO - FOR

10/23/2019: MOTION TO - FOR

REPLY

09/18/2019: REPLY

RESPONSE

09/18/2019: RESPONSE

EMERGENCY MOTION HANDLING ORDER

09/11/2019: EMERGENCY MOTION HANDLING ORDER

EMERGENCY MOTION

09/10/2019: EMERGENCY MOTION

ORDER ON - TO - FOR

10/11/2019: ORDER ON - TO - FOR

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

02/27/2019: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF

02/27/2019: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF

EXHIBIT

02/27/2019: EXHIBIT

ORDER ON - TO - FOR

05/31/2019: ORDER ON - TO - FOR

ORDER

06/27/2019: ORDER

ANSWER

02/12/2019: ANSWER

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/18/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OAS; Judgment Description: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION; Instrument Number: 2020056352; Judge: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: 02/20/20 AT 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED - SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT & RELEASE OF ALL CLAIMS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lingle, Nicholas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lingle, Nicholas

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Comment: FILING #85613467- WARRANTY DEED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lingle, Nicholas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Comment: FILING # 85613467- WARRANTY DEED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lingle, Nicholas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Comment: TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Akishina, Ksenia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Comment: TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Akishina, Ksenia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 1 rocky@rockyrinker.com ; info@rockyrinker.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Akishina, Ksenia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lingle, Nicholas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lingle, Nicholas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lingle, Nicholas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lingle, Nicholas

    Read MoreRead Less