This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/17/2021 at 09:50:01 (UTC).

LEHIGH, TRISTEN M. vs HIMES, SYDNEY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 LEHIGH, TRISTEN M filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HIMES, SYDNEY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4187

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

HIMES, JOSHUA

Tampa, FL 33621

HIMES, SYDNEY

Tampa, FL 33621

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIGORI , CHRISTOPHER NELSON

Attorney at CHRISTOPHER LIGORI AND ASSOCIATES

117 S Willow Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-1911

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES , JILLIAN MAY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT TETREAULT

9617 Royce Dr

Tampa, FL 33626

ZORN , NICHOLAS DONALD, Jr

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT TETREAULT

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 550

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/23/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/20/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/11/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/08/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/20/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/20/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/20/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

05/19/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/19/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/19/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/91757641087 MEETING ID 917 5764 1087PASSWORD 973927 Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING MEDIATION; Comment: *REMOTE* 1/25/2022 @ 2 PM; Additional Info: Defendant: HIMES, JOSHUA; Defendant: HIMES, SYDNEY; Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.; Private Attorney: LIGORI , CHRISTOPHER NELSON; Private Attorney: ZORN , NICHOLAS DONALD, Jr; Date Signed: 10/06/2021; Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL; Comment: TRIAL THE WK OF 11-14-22 AND PTC ON 11-07-22 @ 2:00 IN RM 511; Additional Info: Defendant: HIMES, JOSHUA; Defendant: HIMES, SYDNEY; Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.; Private Attorney: LIGORI , CHRISTOPHER NELSON; Private Attorney: ZORN , NICHOLAS DONALD, Jr; Date Signed: 09/27/2021; Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: - CHANGE OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: HIMES, JOSHUA; Defendant: HIMES, SYDNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: - CHANGE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: JOINT STIPULATION TO SET JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: HIMES, JOSHUA; Defendant: HIMES, SYDNEY; Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.; Private Attorney: JAMES , JILLIAN MAY; Private Attorney: LIGORI , CHRISTOPHER NELSON; Date Signed: 07/27/2021; Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LEHIGH, TRISTEN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIGORI , CHRISTOPHER NELSON