This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 03:35:00 (UTC).

LCM IMAGING, INC.,MOLINA-CEDENO, BETZABETH vs CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 LCM IMAGING, INC ,MOLINA-CEDENO, BETZABETH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1286

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LCM IMAGING, INC.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

MOLINA-CEDENO, BETZABETH

Defendant

CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPRINKLE , SIENNA CHI

Attorney at LANDAU AND ASSOCIATES

644 Cesery Blvd Ste 330

Jacksonville, FL 32211

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/12/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/12/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/13/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

06/09/2022: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LCM IMAGING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LCM IMAGING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LCM IMAGING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: LCM IMAGING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LCM IMAGING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LCM IMAGING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LCM IMAGING, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Century National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sprinkle, Sienna Chi