This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/08/2023 at 02:58:07 (UTC).

Larson, Niles vs Eckerd Youth Alternatives, Inc, a Florida corporation

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 Larson, Niles filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Eckerd Youth Alternatives, Inc, a Florida corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Polo, M.. Melissa, Polo, Melissa. M. and Polo, Melissa M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3248

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Polo, M.. Melissa

Polo, Melissa. M.

Polo, Melissa M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larson, Niles

Defendants

Youth and Family Alternatives, INC.

Eckerd Youth Alternatives, Inc, a Florida corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIEVERS , KAREN A

Defendant Attorneys

AUGSPURGER , LISA JEAN

PENA , MARITZA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

02/15/2023: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

NOTICE

10/03/2022: NOTICE

LETTER FROM

09/20/2022: LETTER FROM

LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL

09/20/2022: LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL

LETTER FROM CLERK

08/23/2022: LETTER FROM CLERK

MOTION TO - FOR

08/18/2022: MOTION TO - FOR

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/08/2022: NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/05/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

07/17/2022: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Defendant: Eckerd Youth Alternatives, Inc, a Florida corporation;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003; Judicial Officer: Polo, Melissa M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE; Comment: AND REQUEST FOR ACKNOWLEDGEMTN OF RECEIPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER FROM; Additional Info: Private Attorney: AUGSPURGER , LISA JEAN;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER OF TRANSMITTAL; Comment: PASCO COUNTY - TRACKING # 9214 8901 9403 8390 2262 80

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: REQUESTING TRANSFER FEES . Pasco County; Additional Info: Defendant: Eckerd Youth Alternatives, Inc, a Florida corporation;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

JudgementJudgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2022413342; Judge: Polo, Melissa M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

DocketUNSIGNED ORDER FILED; Comment: AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: Eckerd Youth Alternatives, Inc, a Florida corporation;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: Eckerd Youth Alternatives, Inc, a Florida corporation;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
04/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Larson, Niles;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Larson, Niles;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Eckerd Youth Alternatives, Inc, a Florida corporation; Defendant: Youth and Family Alternatives, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Larson, Niles;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Larson, Niles;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Larson, Niles;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less