Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/03/2020 at 06:56:29 (UTC).

LARSON, JOYCE ELAINE FEENEY - Estate

Case Summary

On 02/22/2020 LARSON, JOYCE ELAINE FEENEY - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0584

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioners and Trustees

LYMAN, TARA

Sun City Center, FL 33573

LARSON, JERROLD V

BROOKS, ERIN

Otsego, MN 55362

LARSON, MATHEW

Eden Prairie, MN 55344

LAWSON FAMILY TRUST DATED MAY 21, 2019 AMENDED ON NOV 20, 2019

1003 Andover Circle

Sun City Center, FL 33573

HAYES, CEILI

Stockbridge, GA 30281

JOHNSON, MELISSA

St. Louis, MO 63108

HAYES, SEAN

Stockbridge, GA 30281

DEWEY, KELLEEN

Woodbury, MN 55125

DOBBS, MICHELLE

Sun City Center, FL 33573

Decedent

LARSON, JOYCE ELAINE FEENEY

Sun City Center, FL 33573

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner and Trustee Attorney

FRIEDRICH , ASHLEY GIANNA

Attorney at HINES NORMAN HINES, P.L.

315 S Hyde Park Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAMENDED INVENTORY OF P.R.; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketPET FOR DISCHARGE OF PER REP; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketPET TO EXT FILING INVENTORY; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketORD EXT FILING OF INVENTORY; Comment: UNTIL 7/1/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: MELISSA JOHNSON F/K/A MELISSA LARSON AS A BENEFICIARY OF THE LARSON FAMILY TRUST; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: KELLEEN DEWEY, AS A BENEFICIARY OF THE LARSON FAMILY TRUST DATED 5/21/2019 AS AMENDED ON 11/20/2019; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: MATTHEW LARSON, AS A BENEFICIARY OF THE LARSON FAMILY TRUST DATED 5/21/2019 AS AMENDER ON 11/20/2019; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Additional Info: Decedent: LARSON, JOYCE ELAINE FEENEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF PROBATE PROCEEDING TO TRUSTEE, TARA LYMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLA EST TAX DUE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL; Comment: SERENITY MEADOWS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: LYMAN, TARA; Personal Representative: LYMAN, TARA; Petitioner: LYMAN, TARA; Trustee: LYMAN, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDRICH , ASHLEY GIANNA