This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/06/2020 at 06:36:38 (UTC).

LARA, PABLO A vsMOGHRABY, PAULA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 LARA, PABLO A vsMOGHRABY, PAULA was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Battles, L. Emmett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2301

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Battles, L. Emmett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BATISTA, LINA R

LARA, PABLO A

Defendants

CEDAR FOREST LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MOGHRABY, PAULA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BOSTIC, TERRANCE A

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN GOGGIN

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

12/05/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/05/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT

12/05/2019: CIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/10/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

12/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/02/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

12/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

EMERGENCY MOTION HANDLING ORDER

12/18/2019: EMERGENCY MOTION HANDLING ORDER

EMERGENCY MOTION

12/18/2019: EMERGENCY MOTION

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/30/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: CEDAR FOREST LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Defendant: MOGHRABY, PAULA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: CEDAR FOREST LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Defendant: MOGHRABY, PAULA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION; Comment: FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LARA, PABLO A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION HANDLING ORDER; Comment: THE MOTION IS DENIED 12/18/19 ELB; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LARA, PABLO A; Date Signed: 12/18/2019; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SUMMONS; Additional Info: Defendant: CEDAR FOREST LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Date Served: 12/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: MOGHRABY, PAULA; Date Served: 12/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: CEDAR FOREST LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Defendant: MOGHRABY, PAULA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BATISTA, LINA R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LARA, PABLO A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BATISTA, LINA R; Plaintiff: LARA, PABLO A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less