This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/13/2023 at 02:39:16 (UTC).

Laboy, Giovanna vs Fashion Nova LLC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 Laboy, Giovanna filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Fashion Nova LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1579

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laboy, Giovanna

Defendant

Fashion Nova LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASLAVICH , BENJAMIN W.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/25/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/25/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/25/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/04/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

MEMORANDUM

08/25/2022: MEMORANDUM

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/25/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

08/26/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/15/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE

10/03/2022: NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Voluntary Dismissal of Cause; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022477369; Judge: Murphy, J. Logan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Laboy, Giovanna;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Laboy, Giovanna;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: FASHION NOVA LLC 9/8/22; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Laboy, Giovanna;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Fashion Nova LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Laboy, Giovanna;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Laboy, Giovanna;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Laboy, Giovanna;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Laboy, Giovanna;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Laboy, Giovanna;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less