This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/11/2021 at 16:09:02 (UTC).

Koerner, William R vs De La Rosa, Karina C

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 Koerner, William R filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against De La Rosa, Karina C. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7968

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Koerner, William R

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

Capital Group Solutions Inc.

14502 N. Dale Mabry Highway Suite 200

Tampa, FL 33618

De La Rosa, Karina C

Tampa, FL 33615

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.

5351 Nw 106Th Drive

Coral Springs, FL 33076

Vargas, Alexander

Tampa, FL 33607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VESCIO , RYAN JAMES

Attorney at SHUFFIELD, LOWMAN & WILSON, P.A.

1000 Legion Pl Ste 1700

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

GRUMAN , PERRY GALL

Attorney at PERRY GRUMAN PA

3400 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609-2906

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/91757641087 MEETING ID 917 5764 1087PASSWORD 973927 Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM, INC., ON NOVEMBER 2, 2021 - ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: Capital Group Solutions Inc.; Defendant: Vargas, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Capital Group Solutions Inc.; Defendant: Vargas, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Koerner, William R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: RONS - litservice@shuffieldlowman.com ; adouglas@shuffieldlowman.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC - ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: 1. DEFENDANT CAPITAL GROUP SOLUTIONS, INC. ON OCTOBER 19, 2021, A COPY OF WHICH IS ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBIT "A" AND 2. DEFENDANT ALEXANDER VARGAS ON OCTOBER 19, 2021, A COPY OF WHICH IS ATTACHED HER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT, KARINA CUENCA DE LA ROSA, ON OCTOBER 14, 2021 - ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Koerner, William R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Koerner, William R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Koerner, William R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Koerner, William R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Koerner, William R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Koerner, William R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Koerner, William R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Koerner, William R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Koerner, William R

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN VESCIO