This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 01/12/2022 at 21:20:16 (UTC).

KLIEM, JILL vs HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 KLIEM, JILL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, Christopher C., Nash, C.. Christopher and Nash, Christopher. C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9368

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, Christopher C.

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KLIEM, JILL

Clearwater, FL 33759

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

2600 Mccormick Drive Suite 300

Clearwater, FL 33759

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAPF , GRANT WILLIAM

Attorney at KRAPF LEGAL, P.A.

2790 Sunset Point Rd

Clearwater, FL 33759

Defendant Attorney

BOEHM , ALEXANDER JAMES

Attorney at HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE

4400 W Spruce St Apt 281

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/23/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/23/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/23/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

11/23/2021: COMPLAINT

RESPONSE

01/07/2022: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/04/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/03/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/23/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/22/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/23/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COMPLAINT

11/23/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/23/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/23/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/23/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4812642204 MEETING ID: 481 264 2204 Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KLIEM, JILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: VIA ZOOM April 6th, 2022 @ 9:30 A.M.; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, 12/14/2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KLIEM, JILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KLIEM, JILL

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KLIEM, JILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KLIEM, JILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KLIEM, JILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KLIEM, JILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KLIEM, JILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: KLIEM, JILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT W KRAPF, ESQ