Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/12/2021 at 04:21:31 (UTC).

Kliaman, Jan vs Publix Super Markets, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Kliaman, Jan filed an Other lawsuit against Publix Super Markets, Inc. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nielsen, A. Richard and Nielsen, Richard. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3128

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nielsen, A. Richard

Nielsen, Richard. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kliaman, Jan

Miami, FL 33132

Defendant

Publix Super Markets, Inc.

3300 Publix Corporate Parkway

Lakeland, FL 33811

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLUMBERG , ROBERT EDWARD

Attorney at DEUTSCH BLUMBERG & CABALLERO, P.A.

100 Biscayne Blvd Ste 2802

Miami, FL 33132

MERCIER VARGAS , REBECCA

Attorney at KREUSLER-WALSH, VARGAS & SERAFIN, P.A.

501 S Flagler Dr Ste 503

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

SERAFIN , STEPHANIE L

Attorney at KREUSLER-WALSH, VARGAS & SERAFIN, P.A.

501 S Flagler Dr Ste 503

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

KREUSLER-WALSH , JANE

Attorney at KREUSLER-WALSH, VARGAS & SERAFIN, P.A.

501 S Flagler Dr Ste 503

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant Attorneys

HART , CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

Attorney at BUSH ROSS P A

Po Box 3913

Tampa, FL 33601

STANLEY , IAN PAUL

Attorney at BUSH ROSS, P.A.

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS

04/03/2020: TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS

ORDER DENYING MOTION

03/06/2020: ORDER DENYING MOTION

NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION

01/30/2020: NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

04/25/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

04/12/2019: ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

OBJECTION

04/12/2019: OBJECTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/05/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/27/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/25/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

03/06/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/05/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF FILING

11/26/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE

11/25/2019: NOTICE

RESPONSE

05/30/2019: RESPONSE

MOTION TO COMPEL

05/28/2019: MOTION TO COMPEL

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/07/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/02/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/25/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPREPARATION FEE PAID; Comment: $10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAPPEAL SUPPLEMENT; Comment: pg 361-361

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket2DCA RECORD ON APPEAL; Comment: 20-1029 supp2; Additional Info: Due:11/05/2020: Completed: 10/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAPPEAL INVOICE; Comment: $10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM; Comment: ATTORNEY WITH FLASH DRIVE ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketAPPEAL SUPPLEMENT; Comment: pg. 355-360

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket2DCA RECORD ON APPEAL; Comment: 20-1029 supp1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: COPY OF UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDCA ORDER - SUPPLEMENT; Comment: 2D20-1029

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 skd@deutschblumberg.com; Additional Info: Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kliaman, Jan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kliaman, Jan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kliaman, Jan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kliaman, Jan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kliaman, Jan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kliaman, Jan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kliaman, Jan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kliaman, Jan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STANLEY , IAN PAUL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HART , CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL