Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/14/2021 at 02:41:58 (UTC).

Kirby, Troy Todd vsHarvest Field Homeowners Association, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Kirby, Troy Todd vsHarvest Field Homeowners Association, Inc was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hinson, C.. Carl and Hinson, Carl. C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9641

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hinson, C.. Carl

Hinson, Carl. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kirby, Michelle Leann

Ruskin, FL 33573

Kirby, Troy Todd

Ruskin, FL 33573

Defendant

Harvest Field Homeowners Association, Inc.

501 E. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 801

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK , SCOTT WILLIAM

Attorney at OWENS LAW GROUP, P.A.

811 Cypress Village Blvd Ste B

Ruskin, FL 33573

Defendant Attorney

APPLETON , ERIC NEWELL

Attorney at APPLETON REISS, PLLC

215 N Howard Ave Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/21/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/21/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

04/29/2021: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

04/20/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/20/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/20/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/19/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/19/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/19/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/12/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/12/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/15/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/04/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/10/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

12/10/2020: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/10/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kirby, Michelle Leann; Plaintiff: Kirby, Troy Todd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kirby, Michelle Leann; Plaintiff: Kirby, Troy Todd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kirby, Michelle Leann; Plaintiff: Kirby, Troy Todd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Harvest Field Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Harvest Field Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Harvest Field Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kirby, Michelle Leann; Plaintiff: Kirby, Troy Todd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kirby, Michelle Leann; Plaintiff: Kirby, Troy Todd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kirby, Michelle Leann; Plaintiff: Kirby, Troy Todd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Harvest Field Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Harvest Field Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Harvest Field Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Harvest Field Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kirby, Michelle Leann; Plaintiff: Kirby, Troy Todd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kirby, Michelle Leann; Plaintiff: Kirby, Troy Todd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kirby, Michelle Leann; Plaintiff: Kirby, Troy Todd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kirby, Michelle Leann; Plaintiff: Kirby, Troy Todd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Harvest Field Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK SCOTT W