This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/30/2023 at 08:38:11 (UTC).

King, Velma vs Frontier Communications of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 King, Velma filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Frontier Communications of America, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Battles, Emmett L, Daniel, L. Helene, Daniel, Helene. L and Battles, L. Emmett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7228

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Battles, Emmett L

Daniel, L. Helene

Daniel, Helene. L

Battles, L. Emmett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

King, Velma

Defendants

Frontier Communications Corporate Services, Inc.

Frontier Communications of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BACA , GABRIEL ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

07/13/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

WITNESS LIST

07/05/2022: WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/19/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

04/13/2022: ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

04/13/2022: ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

01/24/2022: NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/24/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/02/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Frontier Communications of America, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 09:15 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 502View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Velma;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST; Additional Info: Defendant: Frontier Communications Corporate Services, Inc.; Defendant: Frontier Communications of America, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS LIST; Additional Info: Defendant: Frontier Communications of America, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Frontier Communications of America, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS LIST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Velma;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Frontier Communications of America, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/3078346388 MEETING ID: 307 834 6388NO PASSWORD REQUIRED; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Velma;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Velma;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Velma;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Velma;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Velma;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Velma;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Velma;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Velma;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less