This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/27/2019 at 15:25:23 (UTC).

King, Robert vs ABB, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 King, Robert filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ABB, Inc. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Holder, P. Gregory and Ficarrotta, N. Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2884

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Holder, P. Gregory

Ficarrotta, N. Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

King, Queida

Coral Gables, FL 33146

Defendants

ABB, Inc.

C/O C T Corporation System 1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

DIMMITT CHEVROLET INC

REXNORD INDUSTRIES LLC

Akebono Brake Corporation

C/O Brandon J. Kessinger 34385 W. Twelve Mile Road

Farmington Mills, MI 48331

GARDNER DENVER INC

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Brake Systems, Inc.

C/O The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center, 1209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA INC

WARREN PUMPS LLC

Bill Currie Ford, Inc.

C/O Wilmer E. Currie Iii 5815 N. Dale Mabry

Tampa, FL 33614

FRICTION INC

MORTON INTERNATIONAL LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES LLC

CARQUEST AUTO PARTS OF DUNEDIN FL INC

KUHLMAN ELECTRIC CORPORATION

WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA INC

Borgwarner Morse TEC, LLC

C/O The Corporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SEALEY , J ANDREW

Attorney at SIMMONS HANLY CONROY

1 Court St

Alton, IL 62002

VINOCUR , REBECCA S

Attorney at REBECCA S VINOCUR, P.A.

5915 Ponce De Leon Blvd Suite 14

Coral Gables, FL 33146

Defendant Attorneys

MEDINA , EDUARDO J

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

4770 Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33137-3232

SOTO , NICOLE FARINAS

Attorney at CONROY SIMBERG

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

STURGE, CLARKE S.

Attorney at COLE SCOTT KISSANE PA

9150 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33156

LOPEZ , FRANCES

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP

303 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

SALAZAR , DANIELA CAROLINA

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.

Miami, FL 33156

SMITH , MELVILLE STEPHEN, III

Attorney at RUMBERGER KIRK & CALDWELL

80 Sw 8Th St Ste 3000

Miami, FL 33130

CHUNG-TIMS , MELANIE ERICA

Attorney at BICE COLE LAW FIRM

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 710

Coral Gables, FL 33134

FRANKLIN , JONATHAN DEREK

Attorney at FRANKLIN LEGAL GROUP, PA

9155 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1710

Miami, FL 33156

COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3600

Miami, FL 33131

PAZOS , LUCIA VERONICA

Attorney at MANNING GROSS + MASSENBURG LLP

600 Brickell Ave Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33131

GREENE , MARK CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

FERGUSON , TIMOTHY JOHN

Attorney at FOLEY MANSFIELD PLLP

1395 Brickell Ave Fl 14

Miami, FL 33131

BRISCOE , EDWARD J

Attorney at FOWLER WHITE BURNETT P A

1395 Brickell Ave Ste 14

Miami, FL 33131

Other Attorneys

WEINSTEIN , STUART AARON

Attorney at SHAPIRO, BLASI, WASSERMAN & HERMANN, P.A.

7777 Glades Rd Ste 400

Boca Raton, FL 33434

GOLDEN , JENNIFER ANN

Attorney at GOLDEN & GRIMES LLP

9350 S Dixie Hwy Ph Ii

Miami, FL 33156-2900

SIMONITSCH , WILLIAM JOHN

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3900

Miami, FL 33131

SPURR , DALE JAY

Attorney at LUKS, SANTANIELLO, PETRILLO & JONES, LLC

150 W Flagler St Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33130

CARRUTHERS , ANDREW K

Attorney at HEPLERBROOM, LLC

Po Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/17/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/13/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/11/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

05/29/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/23/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/19/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/19/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/19/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/19/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/29/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

09/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/16/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/23/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

04/02/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/01/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/19/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/19/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/19/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

222 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: HENNESSY INDUSTRIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: FMC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • WITNESS LIST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Queida; Plaintiff: King, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • WITNESS LIST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Queida; Plaintiff: King, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Borgwarner Morse TEC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: King, Queida; Plaintiff: King, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: VERIFIED JURAT PAGE; Additional Info: Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Defendant: FMC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
450 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019405030; Judge: Ficarrotta, Ronald N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Judgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019405133; Judge: Ficarrotta, Ronald N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019392691; Judge: Ficarrotta, Ronald N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019392675; Judge: Ficarrotta, Ronald N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019392624; Judge: Ficarrotta, Ronald N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019364470; Judge: Ficarrotta, Ronald N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019254424; Judge: Holder, Gregory P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019254426; Judge: Holder, Gregory P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019252486; Judge: Holder, Gregory P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019172850; Judge: Holder, Gregory P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division is a litigant

Latest cases where MORTON INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BILL CURRIE FORD, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC. is a litigant