This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/27/2022 at 09:05:42 (UTC).

ILIA KILPATRICK, AS P.R. OF THE Estate of JAMES E. KILPATRICK vs ACOUSTI ENGINEERING COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 ILIA KILPATRICK, AS P R OF THE Estate of JAMES E KILPATRICK filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ACOUSTI ENGINEERING COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Farfante, D. Darren and Farfante, Darren. D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9413

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Farfante, D. Darren

Farfante, Darren. D

 

Party Details

Defendants

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

ACOUSTI ENGINEERING COMPANY OF FLORIDA

777 S. Flagler Dr Ste 500E

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

ALFA LAVAL, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

CANARIIS CORPORATION

3507 Bayshore Blvd. Suite 1402

Tampa, FL 33629

CBS CORPORATION

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

CLYDE UNION, INC.,

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

CRANE CO

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

100 Four Daniel Drive

Greenville, SC 29607

DAP PRODUCTS, INC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

DCo LLC

4400 Easton Commons Way Suite 125

Columbus, OH 43219

DEZURIK, INC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

ELLIOTT CO

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

FLOWSERVE US INC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

FMC CORPORATION

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ALLEY , TODD CARLTON

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP

303 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

CACHALDORA , AMANDA RAE

Attorney at BICE COLE LAW FIRM, PL

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 710

Coral Gables, FL 33134

COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

Attorney at COLLINGS LAW FIRM

255 Alhambra Cir Ste 800

Coral Gables, FL 33134

LOPEZ , FRANCES

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP

303 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

MCCUTCHEON , CAITLYN R.

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

600 Brickell Ave Ste 1600

Miami, FL 33131

REDDIN, JOHN CHARLES

Attorney at LUKS SANTANIELLO PETRILLO & COHEN

150 W Flagler St Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33130-1560

Other Attorneys

KUNEN , MARC PHILLIP

Attorney at THE FERRARO LAW FIRM, P.A.

600 Brickell Ave Fl 38

Miami, FL 33131

DRUMM , ASHLEY CHRISTINA PEARSON

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS, P.A.

525 Okeechobee Blvd Ste 1200

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

MERCER , DAVID A

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

FERGUSON , TIMOTHY JOHN

Attorney at FOLEY MANSFIELD PLLP

4770 Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33137

COLE , SUSAN JANE

Attorney at BICE COLE LAW FIRM, PL

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 910

Coral Gables, FL 33134

LEDLOVA , MONIKA

Attorney at MG+M LAW FIRM

55 Se 6Th St Apt 2706

Miami, FL 33131

SAINT-FLEUR , MOURAMA SWEENEY

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1100 Fl Tampa

Tampa, FL 33602

MASON , W SCOTT

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

777 S Flagler Dr Ste 1700

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

DONET, BRIANNA ELIZABETH

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS

700 Nw 1St Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33136-4118

COBBS , RYAN STEPHEN

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS

525 Okeechobee Blvd Ste 1200

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

JONES , STEVEN CRAIG

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER

Miami, Fl 33131 100 Se 2Nd St Ste 3800

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

06/15/2022: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

E-FILED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

06/15/2022: E-FILED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/31/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

05/23/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/03/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

04/29/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/20/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF JOINDER

04/20/2022: NOTICE OF JOINDER

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/01/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

320 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ILIA KILPATRICK, AS P.R. OF THE Estate of JAMES E. KILPATRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ILIA KILPATRICK, AS P.R. OF THE Estate of JAMES E. KILPATRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: CLYDE UNION, INC.,; Defendant: DCo LLC; Defendant: FLOWSERVE US INC; Private Attorney: LOPEZ , FRANCES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Kilpatrick, Ilia; Plaintiff: ILIA KILPATRICK, AS P.R. OF THE Estate of JAMES E. KILPATRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME; Additional Info: Defendant: CBS CORPORATION; Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION; Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: CLYDE UNION, INC.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: CBS CORPORATION; Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION; Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: ACOUSTI ENGINEERING COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
336 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Kilpatrick, Ilia; Plaintiff: ILIA KILPATRICK, AS P.R. OF THE Estate of JAMES E. KILPATRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Kilpatrick, Ilia; Plaintiff: ILIA KILPATRICK, AS P.R. OF THE Estate of JAMES E. KILPATRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Personal Representative: Kilpatrick, Ilia; Plaintiff: ILIA KILPATRICK, AS P.R. OF THE Estate of JAMES E. KILPATRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Acousti Engineering Company of Florida, Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Elliott Holding LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DEZURIK, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION is a litigant