This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/18/2020 at 19:03:06 (UTC).

KENNEDY CENTER LLC vs 4 U FITNESS, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 KENNEDY CENTER LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against 4 U FITNESS, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perrone, M. Frances. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0580

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perrone, M. Frances

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNEDY CENTER LLC

234 E Davis Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

NYIRI, DANIEL

Tampa, FL 33609

4 U FITNESS, LLC

4036 W Kenedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

08/11/2020: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

ORDER OF NOTIFICATION

07/14/2020: ORDER OF NOTIFICATION

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: NYIRI, DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: 4 U FITNESS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: 4 U FITNESS, LLC; Defendant: NYIRI, DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2020340329; Judge: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: 4 U FITNESS, LLC; Defendant: NYIRI, DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Additional Info: Defendant: NYIRI, DANIEL; Date Served: 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Additional Info: Defendant: 4 U FITNESS, LLC; Date Served: 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KENNEDY CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF NOTIFICATION; Additional Info: Defendant: 4 U FITNESS, LLC; Defendant: NYIRI, DANIEL; Plaintiff: KENNEDY CENTER LLC; Date Signed: 07/14/2020; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KENNEDY CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KENNEDY CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KENNEDY CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less