This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/21/2021 at 01:33:03 (UTC).

KEITH DAVIS - Estate

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 KEITH DAVIS - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Weis, A. Richard and Weis, Richard. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3688

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Weis, A. Richard

Weis, Richard. A

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner

DAVIS, SABRINA

Gainesville, FL 32605

Claimants

BRANDON REGIONAL HOSPITAL

C/O Probate Recovery Systems, Llc P.O. Box 40

Largo, FL 33779

WATSON CLINIC, LLP

P. O. Box 95000

Lakeland, FL 33804-5000

REGIONS BANK

P.O. Box 10063

Birmingham, AL 35202-0063

Decedent

DAVIS, KEITH EUGENE

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

MACK , STEPHANIE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SILVERMAN, MACK & ASSOCIAT

4001 W Newberry Rd Ste A1

Gainesville, FL 32607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $3387.46, STEPHANIE@LAWGAINESVILLE.COM 06/02/21; Additional Info: Claimant: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $3450.01, STEPHANIE@LAWGAINESVILLE.COM 06/02/21; Additional Info: Claimant: REGIONS BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: DAVIS, SABRINA; Personal Representative: DAVIS, SABRINA; Petitioner: DAVIS, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP; Additional Info: Beneficiary: DAVIS, SABRINA; Personal Representative: DAVIS, SABRINA; Petitioner: DAVIS, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Beneficiary: DAVIS, SABRINA; Personal Representative: DAVIS, SABRINA; Petitioner: DAVIS, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketORDER APPROVING; Comment: (AGREED) JOINT STIP FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE INDEPENDENT ACTION (30 DAYS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Comment: FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE INDEPENDENT ACTION; Additional Info: Claimant: BRANDON REGIONAL HOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS; Comment: W/ NOF; Additional Info: Beneficiary: DAVIS, SABRINA; Personal Representative: DAVIS, SABRINA; Petitioner: DAVIS, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: DAVIS, SABRINA; Personal Representative: DAVIS, SABRINA; Petitioner: DAVIS, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOBJECTION TO CLAIM OF; Comment: BRANDON REGIONAL HOSPITAL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: DAVIS, SABRINA; Personal Representative: DAVIS, SABRINA; Petitioner: DAVIS, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $2440.61, STEPHANIE@LAWGAINESVILLE.COM 02/25/21; Additional Info: Claimant: BRANDON REGIONAL HOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: DAVIS, SABRINA; Personal Representative: DAVIS, SABRINA; Petitioner: DAVIS, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: FELICIA LINDSEY DATED 12/15/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: E-FILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: DAVIS, SABRINA; Personal Representative: DAVIS, SABRINA; Petitioner: DAVIS, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Beneficiary: DAVIS, SABRINA; Personal Representative: DAVIS, SABRINA; Petitioner: DAVIS, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-O WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: DAVIS, SABRINA; Personal Representative: DAVIS, SABRINA; Petitioner: DAVIS, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: OATH PR - FILER HAS BEEN NOTIFIED TO SUBMIT THE ORIGINAL PAPERWORK TO THE CLERK S OFFICE FOR PROCESSING; Additional Info: Beneficiary: DAVIS, SABRINA; Personal Representative: DAVIS, SABRINA; Petitioner: DAVIS, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRANDON REGIONAL HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where WATSON CLINIC LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACK ESQ., STEPHANIE