This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/15/2022 at 19:05:40 (UTC).

KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC,Baines, Lesha vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC,Baines, Lesha filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1901

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC, as assignee of Lesha B

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Baines, Lesha

KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorneys

VALEN , EDWIN V

Attorney at HAMILTON, MILLER & BIRTHISEL, LLP

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1210

Tampa, FL 33602

BELL , STEPHEN JEROME

Attorney at HAMILTON, MILLER & BIRTHISEL, LLP

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1210

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/17/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/17/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/17/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/21/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/21/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

07/12/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/12/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

07/18/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/19/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/19/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO STRIKE

07/22/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/29/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: Baines, Lesha; Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC; Private Attorney: FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN; Private Attorney: VALEN , EDWIN V; Date 2: 07/29/2022; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELL , STEPHEN JEROME

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWIN V VALEN