This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 04:30:42 (UTC).

KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC,Pablo, Alex vs GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC,Pablo, Alex filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4293

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC, as assignee of Alex Pa

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Pablo, Alex

Defendants

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Foreign corp

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

SMITH , MELANIE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/21/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/22/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/21/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/21/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO STRIKE

03/30/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

05/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Comment: DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESSES - NOT ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: KAYLEE'S CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Friedman