Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/05/2021 at 06:16:52 (UTC).

KAVOUKLIS, MICHAEL NICHOLAS - Estate

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 KAVOUKLIS, MICHAEL NICHOLAS - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, Vivian. T and Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1310

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, Vivian. T

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

Tampa, FL 33629

KAVOUKLIS, NICHOLAS M

Tampa, FL 33629

Decedent

KAVOUKLIS, MICHAEL NICHOLAS

Tampa, FL 33629

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

HINES , ROBERT D., Esquire

1312 W Fletcher Ave Ste B

Tampa, FL 33612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS; Additional Info: Decedent: KAVOUKLIS, MICHAEL NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERS REP; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Date 2: 05/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Comment: DEENA DAVIS DATED 4/20/21 - OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Comment: DEENA DAVIS DATED 4/20/21 DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: IRENE C GARCIA; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: MARK A GARCIA; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: NICHOLAS M KAVOUKLIS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-O WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLA EST TAX DUE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Comment: (PET, DC); Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: ALEXANDER GARCIA; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: ANDREW GARCIA; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: KATHERINE A GARCIA; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: E-FILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Personal Representative: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M; Petitioner: KAVOUKLIS, CHRISTOPHER M

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, ROBERT D.