This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/30/2019 at 10:57:55 (UTC).

Karpierz, Barbara vs Publix Super Markets Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 Karpierz, Barbara filed an Other lawsuit against Publix Super Markets Inc. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cook, J.. Martha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2530

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cook, J.. Martha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karpierz, Barbara

Tampa, FL 33684

Defendant

Publix Super Markets Inc.

3300 Publix Corporate Way

Lakeland, FL 33811

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANSKY , GLEN ROBERT

Attorney at LANSKY LAW GROUP

5476 Lithia Pinecrest Rd

Lithia, FL 33547

Defendant Attorney

ROUSSELLE , PAULA WALSH

Attorney at BITMAN, OBRIEN & MORAT, PLLC

400 N Tampa St Ste 1450

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/20/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/20/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

02/13/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/17/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/17/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/27/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/26/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/26/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/26/2018: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

04/29/2019: PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

02/21/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

01/18/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/03/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/03/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/26/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/26/2018: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/26/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Publix Super Markets Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Publix Super Markets Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Publix Super Markets Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Comment: 1X, NO SUBP ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Publix Super Markets Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: OF DOCUMENTS DATED JAN. 17, 2019; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JOHN ATTAWAY JR. 12/28/18

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Publix Super Markets Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 - office@lanskylawgroupfl.com ; lisacetrangolo@gmail.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Publix Super Markets Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Karpierz, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less