Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2019 at 09:02:45 (UTC).

JS#1 INVESTMENTS INC vs PAT FRANK AS CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY

Case Summary

On 07/13/2016 JS 1 INVESTMENTS INC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against PAT FRANK AS CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Huey, L. Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6521

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Huey, L. Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JS#1 INVESTMENTS INC

1449 W. Busch Blvd.

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendants

STATE OF FLORIDA

Tampa, FL 33602

NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORP

18400 Von Karman Ste. 1000

Irvine, CA 92612

PAT FRANK AS CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY

Tampa, FL 33602

MERS INC

P.O. Box 2026

Flint, MI 48501

BANK OF AMERICA NA

4828 Loop Central Dr.

Houston, TX 77081

U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2007,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHATMAN , JAMAAL MAKESI

Attorney at THE CHATMAN LAW GROUP

1453 W Busch Blvd Ste A

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendant Attorneys

RUSS , SHELBY KIRSTEN

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH CO., CLERK OF CIR. COURT

419 N Pierce St Rm 140

Tampa, FL 33602

BOHNER , DALE KENT

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH CO CLERK OF THE COURT

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 13

Tampa, FL 33602-4932

GONZALEZ , BARBARA

Attorney at THE MINEO SALCEDO LAW FIRM

5400 S University Dr Ste 502

Davie, FL 33328

GANTHIER , DAPHNE

6409 Congress Ave

Boca Raton, FL 33487

SAMSING , ERIK TYLER

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS LLP

Po Box 3333

Tampa, FL 33601

ANDREU , TIMOTHY ALLEN

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS LLP

100 N. Tampa Street Suite 2200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/26/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

10/25/2016: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO SET ASIDE

10/14/2016: MOTION TO SET ASIDE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

09/13/2016: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

08/31/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

ANSWER

08/03/2016: ANSWER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED NOT SERVED

08/03/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED NOT SERVED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/13/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/07/2016: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/22/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/01/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/01/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/29/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

09/07/2017: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

03/28/2017: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/22/2016: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/13/2016: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/13/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • AMENDED ORDER; Comment: DISBURSING TAX DEED EXCESS PROCEEDS - SENT TO ACCTG; Additional Info: Defendant: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2007,; Date 2: 02/11/2019; Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS; Comment: 1/8/19 PLH; Additional Info: Defendant: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2007,; Date Signed: 01/08/2019; Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS - JAN. 8, 2019 AT 3 PM; Additional Info: Defendant: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2007,; Private Attorney: SAMSING , ERIK TYLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING; Comment: DFDT'S MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS; Additional Info: Defendant: PAT FRANK AS CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY; Defendant: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2007,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: HEARING - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS; Additional Info: Defendant: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2007,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE - TIMOTHY A. ANDREU; Additional Info: Defendant: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2007,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE - E. TYLER SAMSING; Additional Info: Defendant: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2007,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT; Comment: DEFENDANT S - OF SURPLUS FUNDS; Additional Info: Defendant: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2007,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2007,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE, UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2007,

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X5 - jamaalchatman@hotmail.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA NA; Defendant: MERS INC; Defendant: NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORP; Defendant: PAT FRANK AS CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY; Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X5 - jamaalchatman@hotmail.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X5 - jamaalchatman@hotmail.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X5 - jamaalchatman@hotmail.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X5 - jamaalchatman@hotmail.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: DJ; Judgment Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2016402138; Judge: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JS#2 INVESTMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant