This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/09/2019 at 09:47:19 (UTC).

Jones, Aqueelah vs Miller's Ale House Inc

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 Jones, Aqueelah filed an Other lawsuit against Miller's Ale House Inc. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Battles, L. Emmett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0609

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Battles, L. Emmett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jones, Aqueelah

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

Miller's Ale House Inc

1200 South Pine Island Rd.

Plantation, FL 33324

Doe, John

Orlando, FL 32819

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUITO , RALPH M, III

Attorney at MCINTYRE THANASIDES BRINGGOLD ELLIOTT GR

500 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

HEWITT , FAY DEAN, IV

Attorney at RISSMAN BARRETT HURT DONAHUE MCLAIN & MA

Po Box 4940

Orlando, FL 32802

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

04/24/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

04/24/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/17/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/17/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/17/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/17/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/17/2019: NOTICE OF REQUEST TO PRODUCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: - RULING ON DEFENDANTS, MILLER'S ALE HOUSE, INC., OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jones, Aqueelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Doe, John; Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF DEPOSITION- AQUEELAH JONES; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Comment: X 2, 4/9/2019; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Comment: X 3, 4/9/2019; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2019
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 1 ralph@mcintyrefirm.com ; jinnell@mcintyrefirm.com ; juliette@mcintyrefirm.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller's Ale House Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jones, Aqueelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jones, Aqueelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jones, Aqueelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jones, Aqueelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jones, Aqueelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jones, Aqueelah

    Read MoreRead Less