This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/21/2020 at 17:59:52 (UTC).

JOHNSON, TONY, Sr vs JOHNSON, THARASTINE E

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 JOHNSON, TONY, Sr filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOHNSON, THARASTINE E. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tibbals, D. Wesley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7839

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Plant City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tibbals, D. Wesley

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JOHNSON, TONY, Sr

Plant City, FL 33563

JOHNSON, TONY

Plant City, FL 33563

JOHNSON, TONY S

Plant City, FL 33563

Respondent

JOHNSON, TARASTINE E

Akron, OH 44307

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT NON CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Comment: FIRST AMENDED; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr; Respondent: JOHNSON, THARASTINE E; Signed: 01/13/2020; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT NON CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr; Respondent: JOHNSON, THARASTINE E; Signed: 01/08/2020; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING WITHOUT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr; Respondent: JOHNSON, THARASTINE E; Date Signed: 12/10/2019; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Comment: FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE; Comment: WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSRE; Additional Info: Respondent: JOHNSON, THARASTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Respondent: JOHNSON, THARASTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketANSWER- WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Respondent: JOHNSON, THARASTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Respondent: JOHNSON, THARASTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE; Comment: WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Petitioner: JOHNSON, TONY, Sr

    Read MoreRead Less