This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/26/2021 at 17:58:17 (UTC).

ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. vs AMIRHOUSES.COM LLC

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC filed an Other lawsuit against AMIRHOUSES COM LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4041

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

28059 Us Highway 19 North Suite 301

Clearwater, FL 33761

ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

28059 Us Highway 19 North Suite 301

Clearwater, FL 33761

Defendants

AMIRHOUSES.COM LLC

5203 Bay Club Circle

Tampa, FL 33607

KELLEY, LISA

Tampa, FL 33607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBROUGH , JOHN DAVIS, III

Attorney at RABIN PARKER GURLEY P.A.

128059 U.S. Highway 19 North Suite 301

Clearwater, FL 33761

Defendant Attorneys

ASMER , NIURKA FERNANDEZ

Attorney at APPLETON REISS

215 N Howard Ave Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33606

APPLETON , ERIC NEWELL

Attorney at APPLETON REISS, PLLC

215 N Howard Ave Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/06/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/04/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/25/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.; Private Attorney: KIMBROUGH , JOHN DAVIS, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: AMIRHOUSES.COM LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.; Private Attorney: KIMBROUGH , JOHN DAVIS, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.; Private Attorney: KIMBROUGH , JOHN DAVIS, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.; Private Attorney: KIMBROUGH , JOHN DAVIS, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.; Private Attorney: KIMBROUGH , JOHN DAVIS, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.; Private Attorney: KIMBROUGH , JOHN DAVIS, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: AMIRHOUSES.COM LLC; Date Signed: 01/25/2021; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.; Private Attorney: KIMBROUGH , JOHN DAVIS, III

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ISLAND CLUB AT ROCKY POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less