Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/28/2019 at 08:05:16 (UTC).

Incognitus, LLC vsCheatham, James

Case Summary

On 01/28/2016 Incognitus, LLC vsCheatham, James was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee, Moore. Laurel and Levens, P. William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0869

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lee, Moore. Laurel

Levens, P. William

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Incognitus, LLC

9611 Lineberger Court

Brentwood, TN 37027

Dzyna Pty Ltd

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PNC BANK NA

PNC Financial Services Group Inc

1111 N. Westshore Blvd., Ste. 100

Tampa, FL 33607

Cheatham, James

Tampa, FL 33609

Lionshare Group of South Florida Inc

1002 S. Church Ave. 10306

Tampa, FL 33679

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Cheatham, James

Tampa, FL 33609

Lionshare Group of South Florida Inc

1002 S. Church Ave. 10306

Tampa, FL 33679

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ , MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL GONZALEZ, P.A.

5001 W Cypress St

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorneys

UNDERWOOD , SCOTT A.

Attorney at BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC

401 E Jackson St Ste 2400

Tampa, FL 33602-5236

YOUNG , LINDA JING ZHOU

Attorney at RAYMOND JAMES FINANCIAL, INC.

880 Carillon Pkwy

St Petersburg, FL 33716

CARNEY , NATHAN A, Esquire

Attorney at CARNEY LAW FIRM, P.A.

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2600

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/08/2017: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL

08/30/2017: MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF FILING

05/05/2017: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/06/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

12/19/2016: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

MOTION TO DISMISS

04/05/2016: MOTION TO DISMISS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/10/2016: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/10/2016: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/29/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/14/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/20/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/05/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/23/2017: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/13/2016: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/25/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE

06/24/2016: RESPONSE

MOTION FOR ORDER

03/14/2016: MOTION FOR ORDER

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/10/2016: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Defendant: PNC BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: SPECIAL SET- DEFENDANT PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION S RENEWED MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNTS 7 AND 8 OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: PNC BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: DEFENDANT- FINAL AS TO COUNTS 7 AND 8 OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: PNC BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: PNC BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • NOTICE; Comment: DEFENDANT- OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PNC BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: 2/14/19 AT 9:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2018
  • MOTION FOR ORDER; Comment: MEDIATOR'S - COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO PAY MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • NOTICE; Comment: MEDIATORS - OF PLAINTIFFS' AND PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S NON-PAYMENT TO MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Comment: TARA HEWITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • ORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: OF DEFT FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNTS 7 AND 8 OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Cross-Defendant: Cheatham, James; Cross-Defendant: Lionshare Group of South Florida Inc; Cross-Plaintiff: PNC BANK NA; Defendant: Cheatham, James; Defendant: Lionshare Group of South Florida Inc; Defendant: PNC BANK NA; Defendant: PNC Financial Services Group Inc; Plaintiff: Dzyna Pty Ltd; Plaintiff: Incognitus, LLC; Private Attorney: CARNEY, NATHAN ADAM; Private Attorney: GONZALEZ, MICHAEL, Esquire; Private Attorney: YOUNG, LINDA JING ZHOU; Date 2: 08/29/2018; Judicial Officer: Lee, Laurel Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 marianlaw@verizon.net ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 marianlaw@verizon.net ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Judgment Code: OGSJ; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Judge: Lee, Laurel Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ , MICHAEL