This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/22/2019 at 00:32:25 (UTC).

IH5 Property Florida, LP vs Harris, Janiel

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 IH5 Property Florida, LP filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Harris, Janiel. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernandez, J. Gaston and Manning, M. Daryl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7545

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Fernandez, J. Gaston

Manning, M. Daryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IH5 Property Florida, LP

5310 Cypress Center Drive, Suite 105

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant

Harris, Janiel

Riverview, FL 33579

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL , MATTHEW EDWARD

Attorney at THE MGFD LAW FIRM PA

2753 State Road 580 Ste 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE

02/21/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

01/28/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/24/2019: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

01/23/2019: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

01/18/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

01/16/2019: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/16/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/16/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

01/16/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/08/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/31/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/26/2018: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/26/2018: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/26/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/26/2018: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: Harris, Janiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Comment: EMAILED TO ATTY FOR PLTF TO- eservice@mgfdlaw.com ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: IH5 Property Florida, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: IH5 Property Florida, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Harris, Janiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: IH5 Property Florida, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 1/7/19 JANIEL HARRIS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: IH5 Property Florida, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Comment: (DEFAULT) POSSESSION ONLY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: IH5 Property Florida, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION); Additional Info: Defendant: Harris, Janiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Additional Info: Defendant: Harris, Janiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Harris, Janiel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: IH5 Property Florida, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: IH5 Property Florida, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: IH5 Property Florida, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: IH5 Property Florida, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2019050088; Judge: Manning, Daryl M

    Read MoreRead Less