This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/26/2023 at 06:53:26 (UTC).

HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L vs UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul, Huey, Paul. L and Huey, Paul L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9892

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

Huey, Paul L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HABERMEHL , SAMANTHA ELIZABETH

CYRUS, AMIR

Defendant Attorney

VARGAS , CAROLAY

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

03/20/2023: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

RESPONSE

01/19/2023: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/06/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/29/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/29/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/29/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/29/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/02/2024

HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 506View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/7196320493 MEETING ID 791 632 0493TELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME ACCESS CODE AS ZOOM; Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L; Private Attorney: HABERMEHL , SAMANTHA ELIZABETH; Private Attorney: SMITH , ANTHONEY MARCEL; Date Signed: 07/07/2023; Judicial Officer:: Huey, Paul L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Comment: ORDER ON SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Date Signed: 03/20/2023; Judicial Officer:: Huey, Paul L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HUTCHINSON, CHRISTINE L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less