This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/27/2023 at 01:57:32 (UTC).

HOLMES, ANTWON vs BELMONT HEIGHTS ASSOCIATES PHASE II, LTD

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 HOLMES, ANTWON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BELMONT HEIGHTS ASSOCIATES PHASE II, LTD. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily and Peacock, Emily. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4023

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIAZ, ELISA

Tampa, FL 33606

HOLMES, ANGEL CORLEON

Tampa, FL 33606

HOLMES, ANTWON

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

BELMONT HEIGHTS ASSOCIATES PHASE II, LTD

C/O Nrai Services Inc Registered Agent 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

BELMONT-MICHAELS PHASE III CORP.

C/O Nrai Services Inc Registered Agent 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY

C/O Nrai Services Inc Registered Agent 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRUGH , TIMOTHY FRANCIS

Attorney at PRUGH & ASSOCIATES, PA

1009 W Platt St

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

WONDER , CHANTEL CHRISTINE

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 3900

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

03/22/2023: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVING

03/13/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

02/20/2023: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/07/2023: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

02/06/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF SERVING

01/30/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING

NOTICE OF SERVING

01/30/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING

NOTICE OF SERVING

01/30/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING

AMENDED ORDER

01/18/2023: AMENDED ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/13/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/13/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/13/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/13/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Defendant: BELMONT HEIGHTS ASSOCIATES PHASE II, LTD; Defendant: BELMONT-MICHAELS PHASE III CORP.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Defendant: BELMONT HEIGHTS ASSOCIATES PHASE II, LTD; Defendant: BELMONT-MICHAELS PHASE III CORP.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIAZ, ELISA; Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANGEL CORLEON; Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: BELMONT HEIGHTS ASSOCIATES PHASE II, LTD; Defendant: BELMONT-MICHAELS PHASE III CORP.; Defendant: INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Defendant: BELMONT HEIGHTS ASSOCIATES PHASE II, LTD; Defendant: BELMONT-MICHAELS PHASE III CORP.; Defendant: INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Defendant: BELMONT HEIGHTS ASSOCIATES PHASE II, LTD; Defendant: BELMONT-MICHAELS PHASE III CORP.; Defendant: INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Defendant: BELMONT HEIGHTS ASSOCIATES PHASE II, LTD; Defendant: BELMONT-MICHAELS PHASE III CORP.; Defendant: INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER; Comment: DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (GENERAL & EXTENDED CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES); Additional Info: Defendant: BELMONT HEIGHTS ASSOCIATES PHASE II, LTD; Defendant: BELMONT-MICHAELS PHASE III CORP.; Defendant: INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY; Plaintiff: DIAZ, ELISA; Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANGEL CORLEON; Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON; Private Attorney: PRUGH , TIMOTHY FRANCIS; Private Attorney: WONDER , CHANTEL CHRISTINE; Date 2: 01/18/2023; Judicial Officer:: Peacock, Emily A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Defendant: BELMONT HEIGHTS ASSOCIATES PHASE II, LTD; Defendant: BELMONT-MICHAELS PHASE III CORP.; Defendant: INTERSTATE REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY; Plaintiff: DIAZ, ELISA; Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANGEL CORLEON; Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON; Private Attorney: PRUGH , TIMOTHY FRANCIS; Private Attorney: WONDER , CHANTEL CHRISTINE; Date Signed: 01/13/2023; Judicial Officer:: Peacock, Emily A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLMES, ANTWON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less