This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/09/2022 at 21:31:31 (UTC).

Holly Court Apartments LLC vs Lee, Mya I

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Holly Court Apartments LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Lee, Mya I. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3932

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holly Court Apartments LLC

301 W Platt St Unit 425

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

Lee, Mya I

Tampa, FL 33613

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL , MATTHEW EDWARD

Attorney at THE MGFD LAW FIRM PA

Clearwater, Fl 33761 2753 State Road 580 Ste 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/22/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/22/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/23/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/01/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/14/2021: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/14/2021: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/14/2021: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

12/14/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

12/14/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

12/14/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

12/14/2021: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

12/20/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

12/27/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2021665962; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Lee, Mya I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Comment: 12/1/21 MYA I LEE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION); Additional Info: Defendant: Lee, Mya I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Lee, Mya I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Holly Court Apartments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEGEL MATTHEW EDWARD