This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/04/2022 at 02:26:57 (UTC).

Holly Court Apartments, LLC vs Gilliam, Jeffery

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Holly Court Apartments, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Gilliam, Jeffery. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8762

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holly Court Apartments, LLC

4016 Cortez Rd. W., Suite 1202

Bradenton, FL 34210

Defendant

Gilliam, Jeffery

Tampa, FL 33613

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EASON , BRUCE KIRKPATRICK

17 Dr Martin Luther King Jr St S Ste 200

St Petersburg, FL 33705

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/01/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/28/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/14/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/28/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/29/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

05/28/2021: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/28/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

06/04/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

05/26/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

05/26/2021: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

08/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

06/03/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER OF DEFAULT

06/03/2021: ORDER OF DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

06/01/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

05/26/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/26/2021: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

05/26/2021: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

05/26/2021: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: Gilliam, Jeffery; Date 2: 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2021280353; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DEFAULT; Additional Info: Defendant: Gilliam, Jeffery; Date Signed: 06/03/2021; Judicial Officer: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: BY THE COURT AGAINST JEFFERY GILLIAM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO ANSWER AND DECLARATION PER 28 USC 1746 EVICTIONS COVID-19 FILED ON 2/8/2021; Additional Info: Defendant: Gilliam, Jeffery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Gilliam, Jeffery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Gilliam, Jeffery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION PER 28 USC 1746 EVICTIONS COVID-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 1/30/21 JEFFERY GILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Gilliam, Jeffery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Holly Court Apartments, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Holly Court Apartments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUCE KIRKPATRICK EASON