Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/06/2021 at 23:38:34 (UTC).

HOLLAND, JOHNNY D. vs AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 HOLLAND, JOHNNY D filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephens, Scott. Steven, Stephens, Steven. Scott, Farfante, D. Darren and Farfante, Darren. D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0207

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stephens, Scott. Steven

Stephens, Steven. Scott

Farfante, D. Darren

Farfante, Darren. D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLLAND, MARY E

Brooksville, FL 34601

Defendants

PENTAIR INC.

2345 Rice Street Suite 230

Roseville, MN 55113

REDDAWAY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.

100 Charles Ewing Blvd. Suite 160

Ewing, NJ 08628

GARDNER DENVER, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

MERITOR, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

CRANE CO.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED

1209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

TWIN DISC INCORPORATED

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, THE

100 Pearl Street 17Th Floor, C-Csc1

Hartford, CT 06103

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

MONTELLO, INC.

6106 East 32Nd Place Suite 100

Tulsa, OK 74135

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

2595 Interstate Drive Suite 103

Harrisburg, PA 17110

FMC CORPORATION (Northern)

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

PNEUMO-ABEX, LLC

251 Little Falls Drive

Wilmington, DE 19808

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

WARREN PUMPS, LLC

1209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, TN 32301

FMC CORPORATION (Peerless)

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

CARLISLE INDUSTRIAL BRAKE & FRICTION, INC.

350 S. Northwest Highway #300

Park Ridge, IL 60068

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BESSERMAN , DAWN MARIE

Attorney at MAUNE RAICHLE HARTLEY FRENCH & MUDD, LLC

777 S Harbour Island Blvd Ste 310

Tampa, FL 33602

VALONE , CHRISTIENNE MARIE

Attorney at MAUNE RAICHLE HARTLEY FRENCH & MUDD, LLC

777 S Harbour Island Blvd Ste 310

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

FERGUSON , TIMOTHY JOHN

Attorney at FOLEY MANSFIELD PLLP

4770 Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33137

ALLEY , TODD CARLTON

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP

303 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

MCGUINNESS, STEPHEN ALLAN

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3900

Miami, FL 33131

MCCUTCHEON , CAITLYN R.

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 5300

Miami, FL 33131

HORN , HANSON DOUGLAS

Attorney at THE COOK GROUP

115 Broadway Rm 1602

New York, NY 10006

NUZUM , JANNA MARIE

Attorney at THE COOK GROUP

4737 N Ocean Dr Ste 208

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308

STURGE, CLARKE S.

Attorney at COLE SCOTT KISSANE PA

9150 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33156

GUADAGNOLO , RICHARD DAVID, II

Attorney at LUKS, SANTANIELLO, PETRILLO & COHEN

150 W Flagler St Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33130

SALAZAR , DANIELA CAROLINA

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

9150 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33156

COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

701 Brickell Ave Fl 17

Miami, FL 33131

PAZOS , LUCIA VERONICA

Attorney at MANNING GROSS + MASSENBURG LLP

701 Brickell Ave Ste 2000

Miami, FL 33131

UPSHAW , ANTHONY NOLAN

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4500

Miami, FL 33131

IOVINO , CAROLINE MARIE

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMEREY LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4500

Miami, FL 33131

Other Attorneys

BRISCOE , EDWARD J

Attorney at FOWLER WHITE BURNETT P A

1395 Brickell Ave Ste 14

Miami, FL 33131

MELARAGNO , PETER JOSEPH

Attorney at FOWLER WHITE BURNETT P.A.

1395 Brickell Ave Fl 14

Miami, FL 33131

KEPKO , JONATHAN G

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

401 E Jackson St Ste 3400

Tampa, FL 33602

BLACKWELL , DONALD ARTHUR

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

1064 Greenwood Blvd Ste 212

Lake Mary, FL 32746

PIMENTEL , BERNARDO, II

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT, & KISSANE, P.A.

Po Box 569015

Miami, FL 33256

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/17/2021: REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/16/2021: REQUEST FOR COPIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/10/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/09/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFENDANT NOTICE OF HEARING

02/03/2021: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT

01/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT

01/25/2021: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

178 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: DEFTS, UNION CARBIDE CORP'S AND MONTELLO INC.'S, MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS' COMPLAINT AND COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 774.204(3) AS SET FORTH HEREIN; Additional Info: Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION; Defendant: AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION; Defendant: BENNETT AUTO SUPPLY, INC.; Defendant: CARLISLE INDUSTRIAL BRAKE & FRICTION, INC.; Defendant: CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC; Defendant: CRANE CO.; Defendant: CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.; Defendant: DCO, LLC; Defendant: DRILLING SUPPLY AND MFG., INC.; Defendant: EATON CORPORATION; Defendant: FLINT & WALLING, INC.; Defendant: FMC CORPORATION (Northern); Defendant: FMC CORPORATION (Peerless); Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.; Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY; Defendant: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY; Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED; Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.; Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.; Defendant: KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.; Defendant: MERITOR, INC.; Defendant: MONTELLO, INC.; Defendant: MORSE TEC LLC; Defendant: NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, THE; Defendant: NAVISTAR, INC.; Defendant: PENTAIR INC.; Defendant: PNEUMO-ABEX, LLC; Defendant: PREMIX-MARBLETITE MANUFACTURING CO.; Defendant: REDDAWAY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.; Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.; Defendant: SUPRO CORPORATION; Defendant: TWIN DISC INCORPORATED; Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION; Defendant: VIACOMCBS INC.; Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC; Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.; Plaintiff: HOLLAND, MARY E; Private Attorney: ALLEY , TODD CARLTON; Private Attorney: BESSERMAN , DAWN MARIE; Private Attorney: BLACKWELL , DONALD ARTHUR; Private Attorney: BOULOS , GREGORY; Private Attorney: BRISCOE , EDWARD J; Private Attorney: CHUNG-TIMS , MELANIE ERICA; Private Attorney: COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE; Private Attorney: FERGUSON , TIMOTHY JOHN; Private Attorney: GARCIA , DANIEL ALBERTO; Private Attorney: GUADAGNOLO , RICHARD DAVID, II; Private Attorney: HORN , HANSON DOUGLAS; Private Attorney: KEPKO , JONATHAN G; Private Attorney: MCCUTCHEON , CAITLYN R.; Private Attorney: MCGUINNESS, STEPHEN ALLAN; Private Attorney: MELARAGNO , PETER JOSEPH; Private Attorney: MEYER , MATTHEW JAMES; Private Attorney: PAZOS , LUCIA VERONICA; Private Attorney: PIMENTEL , BERNARDO, II; Private Attorney: SALAZAR , DANIELA CAROLINA; Private Attorney: STURGE, CLARKE S.; Private Attorney: UPSHAW , ANTHONY NOLAN; Date 2: 04/28/2021; Judicial Officer: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: FILED BY NON PARTY ARVINMERITOR, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED; Comment: BILLING RECORDS DEPT OAK HILL HOSPITAL, 3/25/21, CORPORATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE; Comment: PETER WANNING ESQ.; Additional Info: Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION; Defendant: AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION; Defendant: BENNETT AUTO SUPPLY, INC.; Defendant: CARLISLE INDUSTRIAL BRAKE & FRICTION, INC.; Defendant: CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC; Defendant: CRANE CO.; Defendant: CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.; Defendant: DCO, LLC; Defendant: DRILLING SUPPLY AND MFG., INC.; Defendant: EATON CORPORATION; Defendant: FLINT & WALLING, INC.; Defendant: FMC CORPORATION (Northern); Defendant: FMC CORPORATION (Peerless); Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.; Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY; Defendant: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY; Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED; Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.; Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.; Defendant: KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.; Defendant: MERITOR, INC.; Defendant: MONTELLO, INC.; Defendant: MORSE TEC LLC; Defendant: NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, THE; Defendant: NAVISTAR, INC.; Defendant: PENTAIR INC.; Defendant: PNEUMO-ABEX, LLC; Defendant: PREMIX-MARBLETITE MANUFACTURING CO.; Defendant: REDDAWAY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.; Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.; Defendant: SUPRO CORPORATION; Defendant: TWIN DISC INCORPORATED; Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION; Defendant: VIACOMCBS INC.; Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC; Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.; Plaintiff: HOLLAND, MARY E; Private Attorney: ALLEY , TODD CARLTON; Private Attorney: BESSERMAN , DAWN MARIE; Private Attorney: BLACKWELL , DONALD ARTHUR; Private Attorney: BOULOS , GREGORY; Private Attorney: BRISCOE , EDWARD J; Private Attorney: CHUNG-TIMS , MELANIE ERICA; Private Attorney: COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE; Private Attorney: FERGUSON , TIMOTHY JOHN; Private Attorney: GARCIA , DANIEL ALBERTO; Private Attorney: GUADAGNOLO , RICHARD DAVID, II; Private Attorney: HORN , HANSON DOUGLAS; Private Attorney: KEPKO , JONATHAN G; Private Attorney: MCCUTCHEON , CAITLYN R.; Private Attorney: MCGUINNESS, STEPHEN ALLAN; Private Attorney: MELARAGNO , PETER JOSEPH; Private Attorney: MEYER , MATTHEW JAMES; Private Attorney: PAZOS , LUCIA VERONICA; Private Attorney: PIMENTEL , BERNARDO, II; Private Attorney: SALAZAR , DANIELA CAROLINA; Private Attorney: STURGE, CLARKE S.; Private Attorney: UPSHAW , ANTHONY NOLAN; Date Signed: 04/05/2021; Judicial Officer: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED; Comment: FLORIDA CANCER SPECIALISTS, 3/23/21, SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED; Comment: PATHOOGY RECORDS DEARTMENT OAK HILL HOSPITAL, 3/23/21, SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED; Comment: RADIOLOGY RECORDS DEPARTMENT OAK HILL HOSPITAL, 3/23/21, SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED; Comment: MEDICAL RECORDS DEPARTMENT OAK HILL HOSPITAL, 3/23,21, SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
242 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HOLLAND, JOHNNY D.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWIN DISC INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where REDDAWAY MANUFACTURING CO., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MONTELLO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PENTAIR INC is a litigant